USA v. Escalante et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00098-52019 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
220
10/10/2018
Release from Custody
10/10/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
222
10/10/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
223
10/10/2018
Notice (Other)
224
10/10/2018
Order of Detention
225
10/10/2018
Order of Release
226
10/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
228
11/01/2018
Release from Custody
229
11/01/2018
Order on Motion for Release from Custody
230
11/01/2018
Order of Release
231
12/10/2018
Forfeiture of Property
232
12/10/2018
Affidavit
233
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
01/07/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.