USA v. Faletogo
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00001 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
39
05/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
40
05/24/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
41
05/25/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
05/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
44
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/04/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
06/11/2018
Judgment
48
06/11/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
10/09/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.