USA v. Farquer
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00018 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
08/16/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
31
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
32
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
09/24/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
09/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
36
09/25/2018
Forfeiture of Property
37
09/25/2018
Affidavit
09/28/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
09/28/2018
Forfeiture of Property
39
09/28/2018
Affidavit
40
10/03/2018
Judgment
41
10/03/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
42
10/05/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
43
11/15/2018
Status Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.