USA v. Feenstra
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00162 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
25
05/21/2018
Response in Opposition
26
05/24/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
27
05/25/2018
Order
28
06/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
29
06/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
30
06/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
31
06/04/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
06/11/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
06/12/2018
Notice (Other)
36
06/19/2018
Judgment
37
06/19/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
38
06/26/2018
Notice of Change of Address
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.