USA v. Figgeroa
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00058 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
06/28/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/10/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/17/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted
47
10/03/2018
Memorandum
48
10/09/2018
Violation Disposition Report
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/17/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
53
11/13/2018
Judgment on Revocation
54
11/13/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.