USA v. Flynn - Michael Wesley Flynn
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

2:2017-mj-00075 (almd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 295 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
03/27/2017
COMPLAINT as to Michael Wesley Flynn (1).
03/27/2017
Arrest of Michael Wesley Flynn (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2017
Case unsealed as to Michael Wesley Flynn (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
03/27/2017
MOTION for Detention by USA as to Michael Wesley Flynn.
5
03/27/2017
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Wesley Flynn
03/27/2017
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Wesley Flynn. (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/27/2017
ORAL ORDER granting Oral Motion to Appoint Counsel: Appointed Federal Defender for Michael Wesley Flynn as to Michael Wesley Flynn (1). Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/27/2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
03/27/2017
Minute Entry for Initial Appearence held before Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer as to Michael Wesley Flynn held on 3/27/2017 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 2:33-2:38.)
03/27/2017
ORAL ORDER directing the defendant to remain in US Marshal's custody pending further proceedings as to Michael Wesley Flynn. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 3/27/2017. (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
03/28/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Donnie Wayne Bethel appearing for Michael Wesley Flynn
8
03/28/2017
ORDER as to Michael Wesley Flynn : Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/30/2017 at 2:00 PM in 5B before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker. Pending this hearing, the defendant shall be held in custody of the U. S.Marshal and produced for the hearing. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/28/17.
10
03/30/2017
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker:Detention Hearing as to Michael Wesley Flynn held on 3/30/2017. Preliminary Hearing as to Michael Wesley Flynn held on 3/30/2017 (PDF available for court use only) (Recording Time 2:15 - 3:25.)
1
Witness List
2
Government Exhibit List
3
Government Exhibits 1-18
4
Government Sealed Exhibit 19
4 Attachments
11
03/31/2017
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Michael Wesley Flynn. Defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/31/17.
12
03/31/2017
ORDER as to Michael Wesley Flynn that based on the evidence adduced at the hearing, the Magistrate Judge concludes that there is probable cause to believe that the defendant committed the offense charged in the complaint and is, therefore, bound over to the district court for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/31/17.
13
04/03/2017
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen P. Ganter appearing for Michael Wesley Flynn
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.