USA v. Fonoti et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00039-59548 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
129
01/16/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
131
01/18/2019
Continue
01/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/06/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
134
02/08/2019
Plea Agreement
135
02/08/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/19/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
160
04/15/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
166
05/06/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
167
05/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
168
05/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
169
05/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
170
05/13/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/15/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/15/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.