USA v. Forte
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00062 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
63
07/16/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
64
07/16/2018
Notice (Other)
07/16/2018
Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
66
07/17/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
67
07/17/2018
Order of Detention
68
07/17/2018
Notice (Other)
69
07/20/2018
Order of Detention
07/20/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
07/23/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
07/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
07/26/2018
Violation Disposition Report
07/30/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
08/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
76
08/02/2018
Errata
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
78
08/09/2018
Judgment on Revocation
79
08/09/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
08/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
81
08/29/2018
Amended Judgment on Revocation
82
08/29/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.