USA v. Fox
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00136-56732 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
48
11/26/2018
Continue
11/28/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
01/04/2019
Continue
01/07/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
01/25/2019
Continue
53
01/25/2019
Seal Document
01/29/2019
Order on Motion to Seal Document (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.