USA v. French
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00080 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
05/24/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
44
05/25/2018
Order
12/03/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
12/10/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
12/12/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
12/12/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
51
12/12/2018
Notice (Other)
52
12/12/2018
Order of Detention

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.