USA v. Gebregiorgis
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
130
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
131
05/25/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
132
05/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
133
05/29/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
134
05/29/2018
Notice (Other)
135
05/31/2018
Notice (Other)
136
05/31/2018
Order on Motion for New Trial
137
05/31/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
138
06/04/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
06/04/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
141
06/07/2018
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
142
06/07/2018
USCA Case Number
143
06/07/2018
USCA Time Schedule Order
144
06/11/2018
Judgment
145
06/11/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
146
06/19/2018
Notice (Other)
147
07/05/2018
Amended Judgment
148
07/05/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
150
08/22/2018
USCA Order
152
09/04/2018
USCA Order
156
09/18/2018
Designation of Record on Appeal
157
09/24/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
158
10/11/2018
Stipulation
159
10/15/2018
Order on Stipulation
160
10/31/2018
Transcript
161
10/31/2018
Transcript
162
10/31/2018
Transcript
163
10/31/2018
Transcript
165
10/31/2018
Transcript - SEALED
10/31/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf (Text entry; no document attached.)
167
10/31/2018
Transcript
168
10/31/2018
Transcript
169
10/31/2018
Transcript
171
10/31/2018
Transcript
172
10/31/2018
Transcript
173
10/31/2018
Transcript
174
10/31/2018
Transcript
175
10/31/2018
Transcript
176
10/31/2018
Transcript
178
10/31/2018
Transcript

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.