USA v. Gillespie
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00062 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
97
06/01/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
07/02/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/05/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
07/10/2018
Plea Agreement
105
07/10/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
07/10/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/10/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
108
07/10/2018
Forfeiture of Property
109
07/12/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
110
08/17/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
112
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
113
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
114
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
115
09/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
116
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.