USA v. Glenn
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00005-59089 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
29
06/30/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
07/20/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
31
07/23/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
32
07/25/2018
Continue
33
07/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
34
07/26/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/26/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
07/30/2018
Notice (Other)
39
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
40
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/03/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
08/13/2018
Judgment
44
08/13/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.