USA v. Graham
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00014-61091 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
5
12/15/2018
Pretrial Services Report
6
12/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/17/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
12/18/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12/19/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/19/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
12/19/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
12/19/2018
Order of Detention
13
01/08/2019
Order
14
01/25/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/27/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
19
03/08/2019
Order
20
03/20/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
04/16/2019
Continue
04/17/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/18/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
05/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
28
05/15/2019
Expedite
29
05/15/2019
Declaration
05/16/2019
Order on Motion to Expedite (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/16/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
05/20/2019
Plea Agreement
33
05/20/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.