USA v. Grant
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00107 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
42
06/05/2018
Appoint Counsel
06/11/2018
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
07/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/31/2018
Response in Opposition
09/14/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.