USA v. Grasser
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2017-cr-00002 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
73
06/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
74
06/04/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
75
06/04/2018
Witness List Public Doc
76
06/04/2018
Exhibit List
77
06/04/2018
Exhibit List
78
06/05/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
79
06/07/2018
Forfeiture of Property
80
06/11/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
81
06/11/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
82
06/11/2018
Declaration
83
06/20/2018
Transcript
84
06/20/2018
Transcript
85
06/20/2018
Response in Opposition
86
06/22/2018
Certificate of Service
87
06/27/2018
Reply to Response
88
06/28/2018
Strike
89
06/29/2018
Response in Opposition
90
07/11/2018
Forfeiture of Property
91
07/12/2018
Order on Motion to Strike
92
07/16/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
07/19/2018
Order
96
07/25/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
07/25/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
98
07/25/2018
Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
07/31/2018
Supplement
101
08/02/2018
Certificate of Service
102
08/07/2018
Notice (Other)
103
08/15/2018
Notice (Other)
104
08/24/2018
Order
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.