USA v. Greene et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2009-cr-00053 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
06/01/2018
Strike
06/06/2018
Response in Opposition
06/08/2018
Reply to Response
06/08/2018
Strike
06/08/2018
Affidavit
06/20/2018
Order on Motion to Strike (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/20/2018
Order on Motion to Strike (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/27/2018
Response in Opposition
07/17/2018
Declaration
07/17/2018
Response in Opposition
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.