USA v. Guerrero
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00038-59525 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
05/29/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
16
05/29/2018
Plea Agreement
17
05/29/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
05/30/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
07/24/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
21
08/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
09/21/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
24
10/02/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
25
10/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
26
10/02/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
10/03/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
10/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
29
10/03/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
30
10/09/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
10/11/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
10/22/2018
Judgment
34
10/22/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.