USA v. Hall
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2010-cr-00004-23907 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
92
11/07/2018
Declaration
11/09/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
12/04/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
96
12/04/2018
Declaration
97
12/11/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
98
03/14/2019
Amend/Correct
99
03/14/2019
Declaration
100
03/15/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.