USA v. Halsey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
22
08/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
10/29/2018
Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
26
10/29/2018
Order on Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - WOA
10/29/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
11/06/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
28
11/07/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
11/07/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/13/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
33
11/14/2018
Bail Review Hearing
34
11/14/2018
Order of Detention
35
11/14/2018
Exhibit List
36
11/14/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
11/15/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/16/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.