USA v. Handley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00460 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/29/2018
Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received
08/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/29/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
4
08/31/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/04/2018
Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
09/04/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
7
09/04/2018
Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing
8
09/04/2018
Order of Detention
9
09/05/2018
Detention Hearing
10
09/05/2018
Order of Detention
11
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
12
09/14/2018
Notice (Other)
13
09/17/2018
Notice (Other)
14
09/17/2018
Notice (Other)
15
09/17/2018
Bail Review Hearing
16
09/17/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
17
09/18/2018
Order of Release
18
09/26/2018
Passport Surrendered
19
01/31/2019
Letter - Transfer of Matter

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.