USA v. Hansen et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-mj-00403 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/27/2018
Complaint
07/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
07/30/2018
Pretrial Services Report
5
07/30/2018
Pretrial Services Report
6
07/30/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
7
07/30/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
07/30/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
07/30/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
07/30/2018
Order of Detention
07/31/2018
Initial Appearance (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
07/31/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
14
07/31/2018
Order of Detention
15
08/02/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
16
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
17
08/02/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
08/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
08/14/2018
Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing
20
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
08/17/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.