USA v. Hansen
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

1:2018-cr-00003-59256 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
34
09/18/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
10/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
01/08/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
01/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
01/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
42
01/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
43
01/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
44
01/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
01/17/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
48
02/14/2019
Notice (Other)
02/14/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.