USA v. Hardy
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00111-60783 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/20/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
09/20/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/21/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/24/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
09/24/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
09/24/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
09/26/2018
Pretrial Services Report
09/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/26/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
09/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
09/27/2018
Order of Detention
12
09/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
09/28/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
10/01/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
10/04/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
10/04/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
10/24/2018
Unopposed Motion
19
10/24/2018
Order
20
10/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
21
10/31/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
11/19/2018
Suppress
26
11/20/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
27
11/20/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
28
11/21/2018
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
29
11/21/2018
Notice (Other)
11/21/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/28/2018
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
12/06/2018
Response in Opposition
12/31/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/08/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
01/23/2019
Report and Recommendation (Final with No Initial R&R)
01/23/2019
Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
01/30/2019
Objection to Report and Recommendations
37
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
38
03/08/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/11/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
03/26/2019
Order
03/29/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
04/02/2019
Supplement
43
04/03/2019
Leave to File Document
44
04/04/2019
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
45
04/04/2019
Notice (Other)
04/04/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
04/09/2019
Supplement
47
04/09/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
48
04/10/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
49
04/17/2019
Notice (Other)
04/17/2019
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.