USA v. Harris
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00074-55738 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
160
11/21/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
161
11/26/2018
Order
12/27/2018
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
163
01/02/2019
Z-Recommendation for Participation in AK Hope Court
164
01/02/2019
Z-Order of Referral to the Alaska Hope Court
01/04/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/18/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/31/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/14/2019
Alaska Hope Court Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.