USA v. Harris
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00006-59093 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
26
05/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
27
05/17/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
30
05/18/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
34
05/18/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
05/21/2018
Notice (Other)
36
05/23/2018
Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
05/24/2018
Notice (Other)
39
05/24/2018
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
40
05/24/2018
DEPS Notice
05/24/2018
Docket Annotation (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/29/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
05/31/2018
Forfeiture of Property
44
05/31/2018
Affidavit
45
06/06/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
46
06/06/2018
Judgment
47
06/06/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
48
06/08/2018
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.