USA v. Harvey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00111 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
74
05/25/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
75
05/25/2018
Declaration
76
05/29/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
77
05/30/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions
78
05/31/2018
Plea Agreement
79
05/31/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
06/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/04/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/17/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
08/13/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
84
08/31/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
85
09/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
86
09/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
87
09/10/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
88
09/14/2018
Supplement
09/17/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
09/21/2018
Judgment
92
09/21/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
93
10/12/2018
Order of Release

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.