USA v. Harvey
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00123 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
40
07/02/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
41
07/23/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
42
07/30/2018
Unopposed Motion
43
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
44
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/31/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
08/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
47
08/01/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
08/03/2018
Notice (Other)
50
08/07/2018
Sentencing
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.