USA v. Hashemian
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00069 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
80
06/29/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
81
07/06/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
07/20/2018
Objection to Report and Recommendations
85
08/23/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
10/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/23/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.