USA v. Hashemian
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00069-57691 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
80
06/29/2018
Report and Recommendation - Initial (Final R&R to follow)
81
07/06/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
84
07/20/2018
Objection to Report and Recommendations
85
08/23/2018
Report and Recommendation - Final
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
87
10/22/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/23/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
01/08/2019
Order
01/10/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
01/28/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/29/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/29/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement
94
01/29/2019
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
02/05/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/11/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/26/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
100
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
101
03/18/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
102
04/08/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
103
04/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
104
04/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
105
04/15/2019
Extension of Time to File Document
106
04/15/2019
Declaration
107
04/16/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
108
04/16/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
04/18/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/22/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
112
04/25/2019
Judgment
113
04/25/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.