USA v. Hawley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00084 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
44
08/29/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
45
08/29/2018
Notice (Other)
46
08/29/2018
Order of Detention
08/29/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/29/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
47
08/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
51
10/11/2018
Violation Disposition Report
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.