USA v. Haynes
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2015-cr-00025-53084 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
85
06/11/2018
USPO Request for Modification - 12B
86
06/15/2018
Order
87
09/21/2018
USPO Request for Summons and Modification - 12D - Sealed pdf
88
09/26/2018
Order - Sealed pdf
89
10/03/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
90
10/05/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/05/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
94
10/10/2018
Transcript
96
10/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
97
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed
12/13/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
01/03/2019
Notice (Other)
01/04/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
01/09/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
102
01/14/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
01/15/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
02/11/2019
USPO Request for Modification - 12B - Sealed pdf
105
02/14/2019
Order - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.