USA v. Hecker et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00049-59893 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
37
05/21/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
38
05/21/2018
Continue
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
06/15/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
06/18/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/21/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
07/05/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
07/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
07/10/2018
Order
47
07/12/2018
Plea Agreement
48
07/12/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
49
07/18/2018
Order of Release
07/18/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
08/02/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
08/06/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
54
08/08/2018
Miscellaneous Relief
55
08/09/2018
Notice (Other)
08/10/2018
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
59
08/16/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
60
08/16/2018
Order of Release
08/21/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
08/23/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
64
08/23/2018
Order of Release
65
08/29/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
09/11/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
68
09/13/2018
Continue
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/20/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
10/30/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
72
10/31/2018
Plea Agreement
73
10/31/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/01/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
75
11/04/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
79
11/05/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
80
11/07/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
81
11/07/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
82
11/07/2018
Plea Agreement
83
11/07/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
84
11/07/2018
Errata
85
11/09/2018
Appear
11/09/2018
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
12/17/2018
Unopposed Motion
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
92
12/28/2018
Unopposed Motion
93
12/28/2018
Declaration
12/31/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
01/01/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
96
01/02/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/02/2019
Motions Referred (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/07/2019
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
01/07/2019
Order Setting Conditions of Release
102
01/22/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
103
01/25/2019
Continue
01/28/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/28/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
125
04/08/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
126
04/08/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
127
04/08/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
129
04/09/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
130
04/09/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
132
04/11/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
139
04/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
140
04/15/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
141
04/15/2019
Declaration
142
04/16/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
04/16/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/16/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
151
04/18/2019
Judgment
152
04/18/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.