USA v. Hecker et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00049-59895 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
103
01/25/2019
Continue
02/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/04/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
107
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
108
03/14/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
109
03/14/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
114
03/26/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/27/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
116
03/27/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
117
03/27/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
118
03/27/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
119
03/27/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
120
04/01/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
121
04/01/2019
Unopposed Motion
122
04/01/2019
Declaration
04/01/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/01/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/02/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/09/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
149
04/17/2019
Judgment
150
04/17/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.