USA v. Hernandez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00056 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
648
06/08/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
649
06/11/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
06/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
651
06/13/2018
Summons Returned Executed
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.