USA v. Hernandez et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2012-cr-00056-48400 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
656
01/29/2019
Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment
657
02/11/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
04/04/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
667
04/10/2019
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
668
04/10/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
669
04/10/2019
Declaration
04/11/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/11/2019
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Text entry; no document attached.)
673
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition
674
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition
675
05/15/2019
Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment
676
05/16/2019
Reply to Response
677
05/17/2019
Order

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.