USA v. Hernandez
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00101-60627 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/24/2018
Information - ALL Misdemeanor
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
08/30/2018
Pretrial Services Report
08/30/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/09/2018
Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
10/12/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
10/12/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
10/12/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
10/12/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
10/12/2018
Amended Minute Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
14
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
15
10/23/2018
Notice (Other)
10/24/2018
Docket Annotation re Duplicate Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/31/2018
Summons Returned Executed
18
11/13/2018
Suppress
19
11/19/2018
Suppress
20
11/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
21
11/28/2018
Notice (Other)
22
11/29/2018
Order
23
11/29/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion
24
01/22/2019
Unopposed Motion
25
01/22/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/22/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/23/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/25/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
01/31/2019
Judgment

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.