USA v. Herndon
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00008-59087 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
06/05/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
29
06/26/2018
Final Presentence Investigation Report
30
07/02/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
07/12/2018
Unopposed Motion
34
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
35
07/13/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
07/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
36
07/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
38
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum
39
07/30/2018
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
08/07/2018
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
08/10/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
43
08/21/2018
Judgment
44
08/21/2018
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
45
11/14/2018
Forfeiture of Property
46
11/14/2018
Affidavit
47
12/26/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.