USA v. Hershberger
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00024 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
78
06/15/2018
Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
06/15/2018
Clerks Notice - Case Reassigned -JDR Retired (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
06/18/2018
Order on Petition for Summons for Offender - 12C
06/18/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/18/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
07/05/2018
Summons Returned Executed
07/16/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
07/16/2018
Notice (Other)
86
07/16/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
87
07/16/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
07/26/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
89
08/10/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/10/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
91
08/14/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.