USA v. Hill
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00092-60596 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
3
08/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
08/23/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
08/23/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/23/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
08/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
08/27/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/27/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
08/27/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
10
08/27/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
11
08/27/2018
Order of Detention
12
08/28/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
09/21/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/24/2018
Suppress
15
09/28/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
10/01/2018
Order on Motion to Suppress (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
10/19/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/25/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
21
10/25/2018
Plea Agreement
22
10/25/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement
11/13/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
11/26/2018
Forfeiture of Property
28
12/31/2018
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
29
01/02/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
01/03/2019
Notice (Other)
31
01/29/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
32
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
33
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
34
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
35
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/12/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
38
02/19/2019
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
39
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address
40
03/25/2019
Judgment
41
03/25/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.