USA v. Hoag
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00054-55432 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
55
06/27/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/28/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/28/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/03/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
02/07/2019
Unopposed Motion
02/08/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
02/12/2019
Supplement
02/12/2019
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.