USA v. Hoff et al
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00060-60063 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
9
05/22/2018
Pretrial Services Report
05/21/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
12
05/23/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
13
05/23/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
14
05/23/2018
Order of Detention
15
05/23/2018
Pretrial Services Report
05/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/25/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
05/25/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
20
05/25/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
21
05/25/2018
Order of Detention
22
05/29/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
23
06/05/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
24
06/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
25
06/13/2018
Unopposed Motion
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/15/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
28
06/18/2018
Continue
06/19/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/06/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/22/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/04/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
09/28/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
35
10/03/2018
Plea Agreement
36
10/03/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
10/09/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
11/05/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
41
11/05/2018
Plea Agreement
42
11/05/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
46
01/04/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
47
01/04/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
48
01/18/2019
Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
49
01/28/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
53
02/02/2019
Continue
02/05/2019
Order on Motion to Continue (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
02/20/2019
Hearing
02/21/2019
Order on Motion for Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
58
03/14/2019
Unopposed Motion
03/15/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
05/02/2019
Discovery
61
05/03/2019
Response in Opposition
05/09/2019
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2019
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/13/2019
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.