USA v. Hooks
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2013-cr-00003 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
76
07/31/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
77
07/31/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
07/31/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/31/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
08/01/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
81
08/01/2018
Notice (Other)
82
08/01/2018
Order of Detention
09/05/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/05/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
85
11/05/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/07/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.