USA v. Hooks
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00096-60618 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/23/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
08/23/2018
Indictment - For Public
08/24/2018
Notice (Other) (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/24/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
08/27/2018
Pretrial Services Report
08/28/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/28/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
08/28/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
9
08/28/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
10
08/28/2018
Order of Detention
11
08/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
12
10/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
13
10/24/2018
Information - Felony
10/25/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
11/05/2018
Unopposed Motion
11/07/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement
19
11/08/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
11/14/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/08/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
23
01/30/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
24
01/31/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
25
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
26
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
27
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
28
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
29
02/05/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/07/2019
Docket Annotation re Incorrect PDF Associated (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/19/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
32
02/25/2019
Judgment
33
02/25/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
34
03/07/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.