USA v. Horsley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00091 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
91
07/11/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/11/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
93
08/03/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/03/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
95
08/15/2018
Unopposed Motion
08/15/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/17/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
99
08/17/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
08/20/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/20/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
101
08/27/2018
Order
102
08/28/2018
Warrant Returned Unexecuted
09/12/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/12/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/13/2018
Clerks Notice (Text entry; no document attached.)
104
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.