USA v. Howe
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cr-00115 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
68
05/21/2018
Release from Custody
05/22/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
Bail Review Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/23/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
71
05/23/2018
Order Setting Conditions of Release
72
05/23/2018
Order of Release
73
06/12/2018
Continue
06/12/2018
Order Setting Hearing on Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
Motion Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/14/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
76
07/31/2018
Notice (Other)
77
07/31/2018
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
78
08/01/2018
Waiver of Trial by Jury
08/01/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/01/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
80
08/02/2018
Notice (Other)
81
08/02/2018
Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)
08/02/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/02/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
83
08/03/2018
Transcript
08/03/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/03/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
86
08/06/2018
Notice (Other)
87
08/06/2018
Trial Brief
88
08/06/2018
Proposed Jury Instructions
89
08/08/2018
DEPS Notice
90
08/08/2018
DEPS Notice
91
08/12/2018
Trial Brief
92
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
93
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
94
08/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
08/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
96
08/16/2018
Continue
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.