USA v. Hurley
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00157-61096 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/13/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
2
12/13/2018
Indictment - For Public
3
12/13/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
4
12/13/2018
Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum
12/13/2018
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Notice of Defendant in State Custody (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/16/2018
Pretrial Services Report
12/17/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/17/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
12/17/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
11
12/17/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
12
12/17/2018
Order of Detention
13
12/19/2018
Vacate
12/19/2018
Order on Motion to Vacate (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/19/2018
Order of Detention
16
12/20/2018
Notice (Other)
17
12/21/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
18
01/14/2019
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
19
01/22/2019
Notice of Intent to Change Plea
01/22/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/22/2019
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
01/24/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/28/2019
Forfeiture of Property
23
01/29/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property
24
03/06/2019
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
25
03/27/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
26
04/02/2019
Continue
27
04/02/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
28
04/02/2019
Declaration
29
04/03/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
30
04/04/2019
Response in Opposition
31
04/05/2019
Order on Motion to Continue
32
04/08/2019
Reconsideration
33
04/08/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
34
04/08/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
35
04/08/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
36
04/08/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Addendum - SEALED PDF
37
04/09/2019
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
04/12/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
04/12/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
04/12/2019
Revised Final Presentence Investigation Report
05/01/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
05/03/2019
Judgment
42
05/03/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf
43
05/07/2019
Forfeiture of Property
44
05/07/2019
Affidavit
45
05/08/2019
Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.