USA v. Hussein
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2014-cr-00013-50226 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
06/19/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
31
07/09/2018
Unopposed Motion
07/09/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/09/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/06/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
08/08/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
09/17/2018
Information - ALL Misdemeanor
38
09/17/2018
Plea Agreement
39
09/17/2018
Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF
09/21/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Plea Entered (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
Change of Plea Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/21/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
10/23/2018
Unopposed Motion
10/29/2018
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
12/28/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
46
01/11/2019
Unopposed Motion
01/15/2019
Order on Unopposed Motion (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/05/2019
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
49
02/08/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
50
02/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
51
02/15/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
52
02/19/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
53
02/19/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/22/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/22/2019
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
03/04/2019
Judgment
57
03/04/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.