USA v. Hussein
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2017-cr-00004 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
101
10/15/2018
Petition for Warrant of Arrest for Offender - 12C
102
10/15/2018
Order on Petition for Warrant for Offender - 12C
10/15/2018
Clerks Notice - MJ Referral Reassigned (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Notice of Arrest (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/15/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Detention Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
105
10/16/2018
Financial Affidavit - CJA23
106
10/16/2018
Notice (Other)
107
10/16/2018
Order of Detention
10/24/2018
Status Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
110
10/31/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
111
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
112
11/02/2018
Violation Disposition Report
113
11/02/2018
Notice (Other)
114
11/02/2018
Violation Disposition Report
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/05/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/08/2018
Sentencing on Revocation Petition (Text entry; no document attached.)
120
11/13/2018
Judgment on Revocation
121
11/13/2018
Sealed Personal Identification Attachment - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.