USA v. Imlach
Criminal Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2018-cr-00104-60764 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
10
09/19/2018
Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)
11
09/19/2018
Indictment - For Public
09/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/19/2018
Arraignment (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
09/19/2018
Order For The Progression of a Criminal Case
15
09/19/2018
Notice (Other)
16
09/21/2018
Notice of Setting Trial By Jury
17
09/24/2018
Warrant Returned Executed
10/16/2018
1 - Terminate Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/16/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
Pretrial Conference (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/29/2018
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
10/30/2018
Trial Brief
21
10/30/2018
Trial Brief
22
10/31/2018
Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
23
10/31/2018
DEPS Notice
24
11/06/2018
Notice (Other)
25
11/06/2018
Bench Trial - Begun
26
11/07/2018
Bench Trial - Held
27
11/07/2018
Exhibit List
28
11/07/2018
Witness List Public Doc
29
12/31/2018
Draft Presentence Investigation Report
30
01/21/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report
31
01/21/2019
Final Presentence Investigation Report - Supplement
32
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
33
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
34
01/28/2019
Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf
35
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum
36
01/28/2019
Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF
02/04/2019
Sentencing (Text entry; no document attached.)
39
02/05/2019
Judgment
40
02/05/2019
Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.